Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3278549

EP3278549 - COMMUNICATION DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  31.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lantiq Beteiligungs-GmbH & Co. KG
Lilienthalstraße 15
85579 Neubiberg / DE
[2018/51]
Former [2018/06]For all designated states
Lantiq Beteiligungs-GmbH & Co.KG
Lilienthalstraße 15
85579 Neubiberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / OKSMAN, Vladimir
67 Culford Place
Morganville, New Jersey 07751 / US
02 / STROBEL, Rainer
Orlandostrasse 6
80331 Munich / DE
 [2018/06]
Representative(s)Sticht, Andreas
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2018/06]
Application number, filing date16712904.831.03.2016
[2018/06]
WO2016EP57067
Priority number, dateUS201562141294P01.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562141294 P
US201562146996P14.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562146996 P
[2018/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016156498
Date:06.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3278549
Date:07.02.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016
[2018/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3278549
Date:19.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04M11/06, H04B3/487
[2018/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN[2018/06]
English:COMMUNICATION DEVICES AND METHODS[2018/06]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMUNICATION[2018/06]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2017National basic fee paid 
31.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/06]
31.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2018Fee for grant paid
06.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)20.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.12.2018
AT19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
DK19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
MC19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
PL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SK19.12.2018
SM19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
LU31.03.2019
IS19.04.2019
PT19.04.2019
[2020/01]
Former [2019/48]AL19.12.2018
AT19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
DK19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
MC19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
PL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SK19.12.2018
SM19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
IS19.04.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/46]AL19.12.2018
AT19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
MC19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
PL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SK19.12.2018
SM19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
IS19.04.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/39]AL19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
PL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SK19.12.2018
SM19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
IS19.04.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
PL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SM19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
PL19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
Former [2019/24]FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
NO19.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT19.12.2018
NO19.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2014328442  (LIU JIANHUA [CN] ET AL) [X] 1-6,19,24-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0078] * [I] 7-18,20-23;
 [XI]EP2728819  (LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,19,24,27,29 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0064]; claims 1-14 * [I] 1-18,20-23,25,26,28;
 [A]WO2010060086  (AWARE INC [US]; CUNNINGHAM CHRISTOPHER [US]; ZHU JIANMING [US]) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0033] *;
 [A]WO2013141840  (ADAPTIVE SPECTRUM & SIGNAL [US]; KERPEZ KENNETH [US]; MOHSENI MEHDI [U) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0049] *