Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3180189

EP3180189 - LINED PIPES AND FITTINGS, ASSOCIATED FORMING METHOD, AND METHOD OF IMPROVING THE CHLORINE RESISTANCE OF HIGH DENSITY POLYETHYLENE PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/25]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KOEVOETS, Christiaan Henricus Johannes
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
02 / FORTUIJN, Johannes Everardus
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
03 / BANFI, Biagio
Via S. Schiaffino 11/19
20158 Milano / IT
 [2017/25]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2017/25]
Application number, filing date16713086.329.02.2016
[2017/25]
WO2016IB51111
Priority number, dateUS201562129988P09.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562129988 P
[2017/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016142803
Date:15.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3180189
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2016
[2017/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3180189
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08L25/06, C08L71/12, B32B25/08, B32B25/16, B32B27/08, B32B27/20, B32B27/28, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B32B1/08
[2017/34]
Former International [2017/25]B32B25/08, B32B25/16, B32B27/08, B32B27/20, B32B27/28, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B32B1/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSGEKLEIDETE ROHRE UND ARMATUREN, ZUGEHÖRIGES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER CHLORBESTÄNDIGKEIT VON HOCHDICHTEN POLYETHYLENROHREN[2017/25]
English:LINED PIPES AND FITTINGS, ASSOCIATED FORMING METHOD, AND METHOD OF IMPROVING THE CHLORINE RESISTANCE OF HIGH DENSITY POLYETHYLENE PIPES[2017/25]
French:TUYAUX REVÊTUS ET RACCORDS, PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION ASSOCIÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE LA RÉSISTANCE AU CHLORE DE TUYAUX À BASE DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE DE HAUTE DENSITÉ[2017/25]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2017National basic fee paid 
13.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/25]
13.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2018Fee for grant paid
18.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
[2019/45]
Former [2019/26]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/12]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
IT28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/10]AL28.03.2018
AT28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/45]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
NL28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/40]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/37]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/35]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
NO28.06.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2014074596  (EQUISTAR CHEM LP [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0008] , [0017] , [0018] , [0074] , [0200] * * claims 1,11,12 *;
 [A]JP2004160993  (JFE STEEL KK) [A] 1-19 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1291387  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0006] - [0008] , [0009] , [0013] - [0015] - [0022] , [0026] , [0027] , [0036] * * claims 1-4,7,8,11,13 *;
 [A]JP2005239784  (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP) [A] 1-19 * abstract *