Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3257256

EP3257256 - MACHINE LEARNING TO RECOGNIZE KEY MOMENTS IN AUDIO AND VIDEO CALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.09.2018  [2018/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2017/51]
Inventor(s)01 / PYCOCK, James Edgar
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
02 / PEEVERS, Alan Wesley
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
 [2017/51]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2017/51]
Application number, filing date16713260.422.03.2016
[2017/51]
WO2016US23496
Priority number, dateUS20151466864625.03.2015         Original published format: US201514668646
[2017/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016154158
Date:29.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3257256
Date:20.12.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016
[2017/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/426, H04M3/56, H04N21/439, H04N21/466, H04N21/4788, H04N7/15
[2017/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/51]
TitleGerman:MASCHINENLERNEN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON SCHLÜSSELMOMENTEN BEI AUDIO- UND VIDEOANRUFEN[2017/51]
English:MACHINE LEARNING TO RECOGNIZE KEY MOMENTS IN AUDIO AND VIDEO CALLS[2017/51]
French:L'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE POUR RECONNAÎTRE DES MOMENTS CLÉS DANS LES APPELS AUDIO ET VIDÉO[2017/51]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2017National basic fee paid 
12.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/51]
12.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/39]
09.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2018/39]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1429528  (SIEMENS INF & COMM NETWORKS [US]) [X] 1,3,5-13,15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 19] , [0 31] , [0 36] , [0 38] - [0040] * [I] 2,4,14;
 [I]US8723911  (SHOCHET OFER [IL]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 31-40, 62-67 * * column 4, lines 1-4 *;
 [I]US2014328570  (CHENG HUI [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17] , [0 21] - [0023] *