Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3283016

EP3283016 - HUMERAL TRIAL AND IMPLANT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/08]HUMERAL TRIAL AND IMPLANT ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF USE
[2018/52]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2018/08]
Inventor(s)01 / MUIR, Nicholas
403 Mineral Springs Avenue
Winona Lake, IN 46590 / US
02 / WINSLOW, Nathan
2677 E. Lake Tahoe Trail
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
 [2018/08]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/08]
Application number, filing date16714172.023.03.2016
[2018/08]
WO2016US23712
Priority number, dateUS20151467807103.04.2015         Original published format: US201514678071
[2018/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016160444
Date:06.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3283016
Date:21.02.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016
[2018/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3283016
Date:29.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/40, A61F2/46
[2018/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HUMERUSVERSUCHS- UND -IMPLANTATIONSANORDNUNG[2018/52]
English:HUMERAL TRIAL AND IMPLANT ASSEMBLY[2018/52]
French:ENSEMBLE IMPLANT D'ESSAI ET IMPLANT HUMÉRAL[2018/52]
Former [2018/08]HUMERUSVERSUCHS- UND -IMPLANTATIONSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG
Former [2018/08]HUMERAL TRIAL AND IMPLANT ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF USE
Former [2018/08]ENSEMBLE IMPLANT D'ESSAI ET IMPLANT HUMÉRAL ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase02.11.2017National basic fee paid 
02.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/08]
02.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2019Fee for grant paid
17.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2009192624  (COLLAZO CARLOS E [US]) [X] 1,5,8 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 14-16,24 *;
 [A]US2004186579  (CALLAWAY GEORGE HADLEY [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0160] * * figures 1,6,10-23 *;
 [A]US8052758  (WINSLOW NATHAN A [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 37 - line 67 * * figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US2014107791  (ISCH BRYCE A [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 3,4,6 *