Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107666887B | Global Dossier | 03.01.2020 | B | CN107666887 | 06.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514678071 | 03.04.2015 | WO2016US23712 | 23.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3283016 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2019 | B1 | EP3283016 | 21.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514678071 | 03.04.2015 | WO2016US23712 | 23.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016160444 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514678071 | 03.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9597191 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2017 | B2 | US2016287400 | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514678071 | 03.04.2015 |