Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3254445

EP3254445 - FURTHER DEVICE TIMING ADJUSTMENTS AND METHODS FOR SUPPORTING DASH OVER BROADCAST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.11.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2019  [2019/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/50]
Inventor(s)01 / GHOLMIEH, Ralph Akram
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / LOTFALLAH, Osama
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / PAZOS, Carlos Marcelo Dias
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / NAIK, Nagaraju
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / SHIVASHANKAR, Nagaraja
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / BASSIOUNY, Nermeen Ahmed
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
07 / NAGARAJ, Thadi Manjunath
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/50]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/50]
Application number, filing date16715372.526.02.2016
[2017/50]
WO2016US19768
Priority number, dateUS201562149776P20.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562149776 P
US20151481246129.07.2015         Original published format: US201514812461
[2017/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016171791
Date:27.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3254445
Date:13.12.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016
[2017/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04N21/24, H04N21/442, H04N21/6377, H04N21/845, H04L29/06, H04N21/262, H04L12/841
[2017/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/50]
TitleGerman:WEITERE VORRICHTUNGSTIMINGANPASSUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON DASH ÜBER RUNDFUNK[2017/50]
English:FURTHER DEVICE TIMING ADJUSTMENTS AND METHODS FOR SUPPORTING DASH OVER BROADCAST[2017/50]
French:RÉGLAGES DE CADENCEMENT DE DISPOSITIF SUPPLÉMENTAIRES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRISE EN CHARGE DE DE DASH PENDANT LA DIFFUSION[2017/50]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2017National basic fee paid 
08.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/50]
08.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/01]
16.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2014189052  (GHOLMIEH RALPH A [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-12,14-25,28-30 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0104]; figures 10A,10B,13 * [Y] 2,13,26,27;
 [Y]WO2014121857  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 2,13,26,27 * page 3 - page 3 *;
 [A]WO2014076052  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-30 * page 12 - page 12; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2014189066  (GHOLMIEH RALPH A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * abstract *
 [A]  - ISO/IEC, "Information technology - Dynamic adaptive streaming over HTTP (DASH) - Part 1: Media presentation description and segment formats // Technologies de l'information - Diffusion en flux adaptatif dynamique sur HTTP (DASH) - Partie 1: Description de la présentation et formats de remise des médias", (20120401), pages I - VI,1, ISO/IEC 23009-1 INTERNATIONAL STANDARD,, URL: http://standards.iso.org/ittf/PubliclyAvailableStandards/, (20130802), XP002712145 [A] 1-30 * page 47 - page 49 *
 [A]  - (20140805), 3GPP DRAFT; DASH-AVC-264-LIVE-SERVICES-V0.5, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG4_CODEC/TSGS4_80/Docs/, (20140805), XP050839847 [A] 1-30 * page 19 - page 23 *