Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3281275

EP3281275 - APPARATUS FOR CONTACTLESS INDUCTIVE ENERGY TRANSMISSION AND OPERATING METHOD FOR SUCH AN APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2018/07]
Inventor(s)01 / STEINMETZ, Andreas
Felsenweg 21A
32760 Detmold / DE
02 / GRÜNBERG, Olaf
Residenzstrasse 27
32825 Blomberg / DE
 [2018/07]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/07]
Application number, filing date16715848.408.04.2016
[2018/07]
WO2016EP57826
Priority number, dateDE20151010535909.04.2015         Original published format: DE102015105359
DE20151011372319.08.2015         Original published format: DE102015113723
[2018/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016162520
Date:13.10.2016
Language:DE
[2016/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3281275
Date:14.02.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016
[2018/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02J50/10, B60L11/18, H02J50/90
[2018/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/07]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTAKTLOSEN INDUKTIVEN ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE DERARTIGE VORRICHTUNG[2018/07]
English:APPARATUS FOR CONTACTLESS INDUCTIVE ENERGY TRANSMISSION AND OPERATING METHOD FOR SUCH AN APPARATUS[2018/07]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE PAR INDUCTION SANS CONTACT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF[2018/07]
Entry into regional phase19.10.2017National basic fee paid 
19.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/07]
19.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2012262002  (WIDMER HANSPETER [CH], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0147] * [I] 2-6,8-13;
 [A]WO2006108787  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]US2015035379  (KWON UI KUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2013087676
 US2010201315