Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3261577

EP3261577 - METHOD OF DETERMINING WEAR ON A DENTAL SCALER TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/01]METHOD OF DETERMINING WEAR ON A DENTAL SCALER TOOL AND TOOL HOLDER THEREFOR
[2019/50]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2020
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENTSPLY SIRONA Inc.
221 West Philadelphia Street, Suite 60W
York, PA 17401-2991 / US
[2018/03]
Former [2018/01]For all designated states
Dentsply International Inc.
570 West College Avenue
York, Pennsylvania 17405 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VANBIERVLIET, Joris
Edelzangerslaan 36/301
3010 Kessel-Lo / BE
02 / HEYNINCK, Jan
Dijkstraat 31
2800 Mechelen / BE
03 / GUARAGNO, Kenneth R.
6061 West Side Avenue
Spring Grove, Pennsylvania 17362 / US
 [2018/01]
Representative(s)Hartz, Nikolai
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
[2018/01]
Application number, filing date16716321.125.02.2016
[2018/01]
WO2016US19449
Priority number, dateUS201562120488P25.02.2015         Original published format: US 201562120488 P
[2018/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2016138196
Date:01.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3261577
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016
[2018/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61C3/00, A61C3/03, A61C19/04, A47G1/14
[2018/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ABNUTZUNG EINES ZAHNSTEINENTFERNUNGSINSTRUMENTS[2019/50]
English:METHOD OF DETERMINING WEAR ON A DENTAL SCALER TOOL[2019/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'USURE SUR UN OUTIL DE DÉTARTRAGE DENTAIRE[2019/50]
Former [2018/01]VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ABNUTZUNG EINES ZAHNSTEINENTFERNUNGSINSTRUMENTS UND INSTRUMENTENHALTER DAFÜR
Former [2018/01]METHOD OF DETERMINING WEAR ON A DENTAL SCALER TOOL AND TOOL HOLDER THEREFOR
Former [2018/01]PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'USURE SUR UN OUTIL DE DÉTARTRAGE DENTAIRE ET SUPPORT D'OUTIL ASSOCIÉ
Entry into regional phase16.08.2017National basic fee paid 
16.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
16.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9727562  (ASKO INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]US5871392  (MEIKLE SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 24, line 36 - column 25, line 64; figure - *;
 [A]US6369375  (ISHIWATA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2402740  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [AP]KR20160016735  (CHOE SEONG SUK [KR]) [AP] 1-16 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11]; figure - *