Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3280360

EP3280360 - CONVERTIBLE GLENOID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
[2018/07]
Inventor(s)01 / HOPKINS, Andrew
Schlossackerstrasse 5
CH-8404 Winterthur / CH
 [2018/07]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/07]
Application number, filing date16716434.206.04.2016
[2018/07]
WO2016US26106
Priority number, dateUS201562144031P07.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562144031 P
[2018/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016164385
Date:13.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3280360
Date:14.02.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016
[2018/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/40, A61F2/30
[2018/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/07]
TitleGerman:KONVERTIERBARES GLENOID[2018/07]
English:CONVERTIBLE GLENOID[2018/07]
French:SYSTÈME GLÉNOÏDIEN CONVERTIBLE[2018/07]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2017National basic fee paid 
07.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/07]
07.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US4964865  (BURKHEAD WAYNE Z [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11,16,17,19 * column 7, line 9 - column 8, line 48; figures 8-19 * [Y] 20 [I] 8,9,14,15;
 [XY]US2012253467  (FRANKLE MARK [US]) [X] 1,11-15 * paragraphs [0081] - [0097] - [ 131] - [0133] - [0141] - [0147]; figures 3-14, 36-37, 44-70 * [Y] 20;
 [XI]US6679916  (FRANKLE MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,11 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 22; figure - * [I] 7,8,14,15,18;
 [A]US2010249938  (GUNTHER STEPHEN B [US], et al) [A] 1,12,20 * paragraphs [0123] , [0124]; figures 27-45 *