Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3283002

EP3283002 - AN IMPROVED TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare (UK) IP Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2018/08]
Inventor(s)01 / DIAMOND, David
10 Riverwood Dale
Castleknock
Dublin 15 / IE
02 / DIAMOND, Jean
10 Riverwood Dale
Castleknock
Dublin 15 / IE
 [2018/08]
Representative(s)Povey, Alexander W.G.
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2018/08]
Application number, filing date16716608.115.04.2016
[2018/08]
WO2016EP58444
Priority number, dateIE2015000010415.04.2015         Original published format: IE 20150104
[2018/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016166342
Date:20.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3283002
Date:21.02.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016
[2018/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61C17/34, A61C17/22, A46B9/02
[2018/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/08]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE ZAHNBÜRSTE[2018/08]
English:AN IMPROVED TOOTHBRUSH[2018/08]
French:BROSSE À DENTS AMÉLIORÉE[2018/08]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2017National basic fee paid 
25.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2017Examination requested  [2018/08]
25.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
18.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2014173839  (HENDERSON ALAN [US]) [X] 1-13,15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0038]; claims 1-4, 14 * [I] 14;
 [XI]US2013055515  (DIAMOND DAVID [IE], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * paragraphs [0045] - [0063] * [I] 9;
 [XI]US2010132140  (DIAMOND JEAN [US]) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0052] - [0066]; claims 1-9 * [I] 9;
 [XI]WO2014178206  (YANAGI TOKISATORU [JP]) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0036]; figures 1-4 * [I] 9;
 [X]US2004200748  (KLASSEN LAMBERTA A M [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,12,15 * paragraphs [0135] - [0149] - [ 131]; figures 59-61, 47-49 *;
 [X]DE8713194U  (W. ZIMMERMANN) [X] 1-3,7,8,11-15 * p. 8, last paragraph to p. 15, first paragraph;; figures 1-4, 7 *;
 [XPI]JP5721036B  (YANAGI TOKISATO) [XP] 1-8,10-15 * page 7, line 10 - page 9, line 12; figures 1-4 * [I] 9