Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3283039

EP3283039 - APPARATUS FOR MANAGEMENT OF A PARKINSON'S DISEASE PATIENT'S GAIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National University of Ireland Galway
University Road
Galway / IE
[2018/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Ó LAIGHIN, Gearóid
114 Ocean Wave
Salthill
Galway / IE
02 / QUINLAN, Leo
42 Oranisland
Oranmore
County Galway / IE
03 / SWEENEY, Dean
4 Hill Top Crescent
Drumbow
Stranorlar
County Donegal / IE
04 / CORLEY, Gavin
Beechpark
Ennis
County Clare / IE
05 / FEEHILLY, James
Corskeaghbeg
Barnaderg
Tuam
Galway / IE
06 / BROWNE, Patrick
Springlawn
Moutbellew
Ballinasloe
County Galway / IE
 [2018/08]
Representative(s)John A. O'Brien & Associates
Shannon Lodge
Casement Road
Bandon
County Cork, P72 TN24 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2018/08]Weldon, Michael James , et al
John A. O'Brien & Associates
Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre
Orchard Lane
Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE
Application number, filing date16717610.615.04.2016
[2018/08]
WO2016EP58341
Priority number, dateEP2015016398717.04.2015         Original published format: EP 15163987
[2018/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016166281
Date:20.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3283039
Date:21.02.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016
[2018/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3283039
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61H3/00, A61N1/36
[2018/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM MANAGEMENT DES GANGS EINES PATIENTEN MIT MORBUS PARKINSON[2018/08]
English:APPARATUS FOR MANAGEMENT OF A PARKINSON'S DISEASE PATIENT'S GAIT[2018/08]
French:APPAREIL DE GESTION DE LA DÉMARCHE D'UN PATIENT ATTEINT PAR LA MALADIE DE PARKINSON[2018/08]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2017National basic fee paid 
18.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/08]
18.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2019Fee for grant paid
05.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
05.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL15.05.2019
AT15.05.2019
CZ15.05.2019
DK15.05.2019
EE15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
IT15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
LV15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
RS15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
SK15.05.2019
BG15.08.2019
NO15.08.2019
GR16.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/11]AL15.05.2019
AT15.05.2019
CZ15.05.2019
DK15.05.2019
EE15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
LV15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
RS15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
SK15.05.2019
BG15.08.2019
NO15.08.2019
GR16.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2020/09]AL15.05.2019
CZ15.05.2019
DK15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
LV15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
RS15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
BG15.08.2019
NO15.08.2019
GR16.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
LV15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
RS15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
BG15.08.2019
NO15.08.2019
GR16.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
LV15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
RS15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
GR16.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL15.05.2019
ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
HR15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
NL15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
SE15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
PT15.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES15.05.2019
FI15.05.2019
LT15.05.2019
NO15.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2009099627  (MOLNAR GREGORY F [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0050] - [0127] - [ 178] - [0193]; figures 1A, 1B, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 15 * [I] 2-48;
 [XI]US2014249600  (HERUTH KENNETH T [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0138] - [0149]; figures 10-11 * [I] 2-48;
 [A]US2014249452  (MARSH RODNEY IAN MCLEOD [AU] ET AL) [A] 1-48 * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] - [0 64] - [0069] *;
 [A]EP1558333  (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [A] 1-48 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2014249452
 US7917225
 EP2586489
 US2009099627
 US2014249600