Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3283039 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3283039



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 419
03.07.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
27.05.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
18.04.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.04.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.04.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
05.04.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
05.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.12.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.12.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.12.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.12.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 58
17.12.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 58
22.11.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.07.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
05.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 11
05.07.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
05.07.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 8
05.07.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
05.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.01.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.01.2018 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
04.12.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.12.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.12.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.12.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.12.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.12.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
18.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.10.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.08.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
26.06.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
26.06.2017 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
08.11.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
20.10.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
20.10.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 64
14.06.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
14.06.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
14.06.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
28.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
28.04.2016 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
28.04.2016 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
28.04.2016 Substitute sheet (R26) - Drawings PCT receiving Office 4
21.04.2016 Invitation to correct defects in the international application PCT receiving Office 2
21.04.2016 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 8
20.04.2016 Annex PCT receiving Office 1
20.04.2016 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
15.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
15.04.2016 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
15.04.2016 Claims PCT receiving Office 9
15.04.2016 Description PCT receiving Office 38
15.04.2016 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
15.04.2016 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
15.04.2016 Drawings PCT receiving Office 16
15.04.2016 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 5