Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3283039


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2020 [2020/12]
07.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2020 [2020/11]
24.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2020 [2020/09]
05.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.01.2020  [2020/01]
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019  [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019  [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
03.07.2019 Change - representative
12.04.2019 (Expected) grant published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
09.04.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.04.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.04.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.07.2018 Amendment by applicant
22.06.2018 Change: Validation states published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
22.06.2018 Change - extension states published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
23.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.01.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
19.01.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
19.01.2018 Request for examination filed published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
29.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
28.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
18.10.2017 Change - representative
18.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
26.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
21.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
03.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication