Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3283039
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018140842Global Dossier 24.05.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP15163987 17.04.2015
WO2016EP58341 15.04.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3283039Global Dossier 15.05.2019B1
EP3283039 21.02.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP15163987 17.04.2015
WO2016EP58341 15.04.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016166281Global Dossier 20.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP15163987 17.04.2015