Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3262830

EP3262830 - CALL PICKUP WITH SEEMAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.06.2018  [2018/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
[2018/01]
Inventor(s)01 / WOOLSEY, Kerry David
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / DUTTA, Amit Kumar
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / MATKOWSKI, Mieszko G.
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / ANANTHANARAYANAN, Krishnan
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / RAMAN, Ganapathy V.
Microsoft Technology Licensing
LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way, Redmond
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
06 / SEKARAN, Mahendra D.
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2018/01]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2018/01]
Application number, filing date16717783.112.04.2016
[2018/01]
WO2016US27009
Priority number, dateUS20151468653614.04.2015         Original published format: US201514686536
[2018/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016168130
Date:20.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3262830
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016
[2018/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, H04M3/537
[2018/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANRUFAUFNAHME MIT SEE-MAIL[2018/01]
English:CALL PICKUP WITH SEEMAIL[2018/01]
French:PRISE D'APPEL AVEC SEEMAIL[2018/01]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2017National basic fee paid 
29.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.09.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
29.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2006223502  (DOULTON DANIEL M [GB]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1,7,8,9 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0127] *;
 [IA]US2009028304  (BURCKART ERIK J [US] ET AL) [I] 11-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * [A] 6-10
 [Y]  - KOURNPIS K ET AL, "An advanced integrated architecture for wireless voicemail data retrieval", INFORMATION NETWORKING, 2001. PROCEEDINGS. 15TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 31 JANUARY - 2 FEBRUARY 2, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010131), ISBN 978-0-7695-0951-8, pages 403 - 410, XP010534302 [Y] 1-5 * page 403, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 404, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 404, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 405, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 408, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 408, column 1, paragraph 4 *
 [A]  - TONY BELKIN BORIS SPECTOR RALPH RILEY, "TRANSLATING VOICE MAIL TO TEXT FOR SHORT MESSAGE DELIVERY", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20020515), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013003074 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *