Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3283013

EP3283013 - ACETABULAR IMPLANT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2018/08]For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLP
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw IN 46582 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DAVENPORT, Austen
2736 N. 50 W.
Columbia City, Indiana 46725 / US
02 / KLUNK, Stephanie
4403 Hidden Oaks Lane
Hamilton, Ohio 45011 / US
 [2018/08]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/08]
Application number, filing date16717820.114.04.2016
[2018/08]
WO2016US27489
Priority number, dateUS201562148786P17.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562148786 P
[2018/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016168434
Date:20.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3283013
Date:21.02.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016
[2018/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3283013
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/34, A61F2/46
[2019/17]
Former International [2018/08]A61F2/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HÜFTPFANNENIMPLANTATSYSTEM[2018/08]
English:ACETABULAR IMPLANT SYSTEM[2018/08]
French:SYSTÈME D'IMPLANT COTYLOÏDE[2018/08]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2017National basic fee paid 
17.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/08]
17.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.06.2018Observations by third parties
02.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2019Fee for grant paid
30.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19202108.7
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2007239283  (BERGER RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,17-20 * paragraph [0025] * * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [XA]EP0234811  (PFIZER HOSPITAL PROD [US]) [X] 17-20 * figures 1-5 * * claim 1 * [A] 1-9;
 [A]EP0315795  (SULZER AG [CH]) [A] 1-9,17-20 * figures 1,2 *
ExaminationWO2008106598