Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3285723

EP3285723 - A LOW VISCOSITY HAIR CARE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2018/09]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHAO, Jean, Jianqun
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
02 / GLENN, Robert, Wayne, Jr.
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
03 / THOMPSON, Todd, Ryan
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
04 / TORRES RIVERA, Jazmin, Veronica
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
05 / MULLEN, Sarah, Elizabeth
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
06 / HUTTON, Howard, David, III
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
07 / KOENIG, Peter, Herbert
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
08 / EIKE, David, Michael
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
 [2018/09]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/09]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date16719187.322.04.2016
[2018/09]
WO2016US28736
Priority number, dateUS201562151601P23.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562151601 P
[2018/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016172406
Date:27.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3285723
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/33, A61K8/42, A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, A61K8/73, A61K8/81
[2018/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/09]
TitleGerman:NIEDRIGVISKOSE HAARPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2018/09]
English:A LOW VISCOSITY HAIR CARE COMPOSITION[2018/09]
French:COMPOSITION DE SOINS CAPILLAIRES À FAIBLE VISCOSITÉ[2018/09]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2017National basic fee paid 
16.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/09]
16.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/41]
03.06.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/41]
Divisional application(s)EP17167835.2   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 24.04.2017
EP18173033.4  / EP3384895
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2005164896  (DABKOWSKI DIANE M [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,4,10,11 * * tables 4A, 7, 6 *;
 [Y]US2009221463  (KITKO DAVID JOHNATHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Formulations A and C;; example 2; table 2 * * paragraphs [0058] , [ 0152] , [ 0154] , [ 0203] *;
 [Y]US5417965  (JANCHITRAPONVEJ BEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * examples 1-3 * * column 10, lines 54-68 *;
 [Y]EP0574086  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 6-13 * * example III *;
 [Y]US2014348886  (JOHNSON ERIC SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * examples 1-5,13-18,22 * * column 9; table 2 *;
 [Y]WO8800184  (GAF CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * pages 50-51; example XXVIII; table 11 *
by applicantUS8440605
 US2009155383
 US2009221463
 US5104646
 US5106609
 US3929678
 US2658072
 US2438091
 US2528378
 US34584
 US4476282
 US2007276087
 US5284972
 US5747440
    - SOLAREK, D. B., Cationic Starches in Modified Starches: Properties and Uses, CRC PRESS, INC., (1986), pages 113 - 125
    - QIN-JI PENG; ARTHUR S. PERLIN, "Observation on NMR Spectra of Starches in Dimethyl Sulfoxide, Iodine-Complexing, and Solvating in Water-Dimethyl Sulfoxide", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 160, pages 57 - 72
    - J. HOWARD BRADBURY; J. GRANT COLLINS, "An Approach to the Structural Analysis of Oligosaccharides by NMR Spectroscopy", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1979), vol. 71, pages 15 - 25
    - STEVEN ABBOTT; HIROSHI YAMAMOTO'S, HSPIP - HANSEN SOLUBILITY PARAMETERS IN PRACTICE
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, (1989), vol. 15, pages 204 - 308
    - A E MARTELL; R M SMITH, Critical Stability Constants, PLENUM PRESS, (1974), vol. 1