Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3285879

EP3285879 - LOW VISCOSITY HAIR CARE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2018/09]
Inventor(s)01 / THOMPSON, Todd, Ryan
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
02 / KOENIG, Peter, Herbert
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
03 / GLENN, Robert, Wayne, Jr.
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
04 / EIKE, David, Michael
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
05 / HUTTON, Howard, David, III
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
 [2018/09]
Representative(s)Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/09]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date16719708.622.04.2016
[2018/09]
WO2016US28729
Priority number, dateUS201562151636P23.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562151636 P
[2018/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016172401
Date:27.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3285879
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61Q5/00, A61K8/04, A61K8/31, A61K8/34, A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61K8/49
[2018/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/09]
TitleGerman:NIEDRIGVISKOSE KÖRPERPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2018/09]
English:LOW VISCOSITY HAIR CARE COMPOSITION[2018/09]
French:COMPOSITION DE SOINS CAPILLAIRES À FAIBLE VISCOSITÉ[2018/09]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2017National basic fee paid 
12.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2017Examination requested  [2018/09]
12.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
17.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2018/49]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2014039066  (GRIMADELL LOUISE [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-24 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0065] *;
 [I]WO2010061386  (B G NEGEV TECHNOLOGIES AND APP [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 4, line 8 - page 4, line 15 *
by applicantUS5104646
 US5106609
 US3929678
 US2658072
 US2438091
 US2528378
 US34584
 US4476282
 US2007276087
 US5284972
 US5747440
 WO2004078903
 WO2004078901
 WO2005078063
    - "HSPIP - Hansen Solubility Parameters in Practice", STEVEN ABBOTT; HIROSHI YAMAMOTO'S, program
    - SOLAREK, D. B., Cationic Starches in Modified Starches: Properties and Uses, CRC PRESS, INC., (1986), pages 113 - 125
    - QIN-JI PENG; ARTHUR S. PERLIN, "Observation on NMR Spectra of Starches in Dimethyl Sulfoxide, Iodine-Complexing, and Solvating in Water-Dimethyl Sulfoxide", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 160, pages 57 - 72
    - J. HOWARD BRADBURY; J. GRANT COLLINS, "An Approach to the Structural Analysis of Oligosaccharides by NMR Spectroscopy", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1979), vol. 71, pages 15 - 25
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1989), vol. 15, pages 204 - 308
    - A E MARTELL; R M SMITH, Critical Stability Constants, PLENUM PRESS, (1974), vol. 1
    - STEVEN ABBOTT; HIROSHI YAMAMOTO'S, "HSPIP - Hansen Solubility Parameters in Practice", PROGRAM