Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3291743

EP3291743 - ANCHORING SYSTEM FOR SECURING A SUTURE TO A PRE-DRILLED BORE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/11]ANCHORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SECURING A SUTURE TO A PRE-DRILLED BORE
[2019/33]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  31.10.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Sports Medicine, LLC
56 E. Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
[2018/11]
Inventor(s)01 / PALESE, Christopher
57 EMS C31 Lane
Warsaw, Indiana 46787 / US
02 / HOEPPNER, Jacy C.
1827 Hobart Court
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
03 / STONE, Kevin T.
2615 Harmony Court
Winona Lake, Indiana 46590 / US
04 / MERIDEW, Jason D.
2211 Laurelwood Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
 [2018/11]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/11]
Application number, filing date16719727.622.04.2016
[2018/11]
WO2016US28885
Priority number, dateUS201562152270P24.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562152270 P
[2018/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016172508
Date:27.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3291743
Date:14.03.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016
[2018/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04
[2018/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/11]
TitleGerman:VERANKERUNGSSYSTEM ZUR SICHERUNG EINES CHIRURGISCHEN FADENS AN EINER VORGEBOHRTEN BOHRUNG[2019/33]
English:ANCHORING SYSTEM FOR SECURING A SUTURE TO A PRE-DRILLED BORE[2019/33]
French:SYSTÈME D'ANCRAGE POUR FIXER UNE SUTURE À UN ALÉSAGE PRÉ-PERCÉ[2019/33]
Former [2018/11]VERANKERUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG EINES CHIRURGISCHEN FADENS AN EINER VORGEBOHRTEN BOHRUNG
Former [2018/11]ANCHORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SECURING A SUTURE TO A PRE-DRILLED BORE
Former [2018/11]SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANCRAGE POUR FIXER UNE SUTURE À UN ALÉSAGE PRÉ-PERCÉ
Entry into regional phase23.11.2017National basic fee paid 
23.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/11]
23.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]FR3005257  (S B M [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 16, line 5 - page 19, line 31 *;
 [A]US2013144334  (BOUDUBAN NICOLAS [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008306511  (COOPER JOHN JOSEPH [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009281581  (BERG JEFFERY H [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *