Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3272098

EP3272098 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SPONSORED CONNECTIVITY TO WIRELESS NETWORKS USING APPLICATION-SPECIFIC NETWORK ACCESS CREDENTIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, CZ, EE, RO, SK
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2018/04]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Soo Bum
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / PALANIGOUNDER, Anand
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / HORN, Gavin Bernard
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2018/04]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2018/04]
Application number, filing date16720206.801.03.2016
[2018/04]
WO2016US20224
Priority number, dateUS201562134206P17.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562134206 P
US20151482943218.08.2015         Original published format: US201514829432
[2018/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016148902
Date:22.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3272098
Date:24.01.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016
[2018/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3272098
Date:23.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04W60/00, H04W76/11, H04W4/20, H04L29/08
[2018/29]
Former International [2018/04]H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04W4/20, H04W12/06, H04W48/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR GESPONSERTE KONNEKTIVITÄT AN DRAHTLOSE NETZWERKE MITTELS ANWENDUNGSSPEZIFISCHER NETZWERKZUGANGSBERECHTIGUNGEN[2018/04]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SPONSORED CONNECTIVITY TO WIRELESS NETWORKS USING APPLICATION-SPECIFIC NETWORK ACCESS CREDENTIALS[2018/04]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE CONNECTIVITÉ SPONSORISÉE À DES RÉSEAUX SANS FIL AU MOYEN DE JUSTIFICATIFS D'IDENTITÉ D'ACCÈS AU RÉSEAU SPÉCIFIQUES À L'APPLICATION[2018/04]
Entry into regional phase02.08.2017National basic fee paid 
02.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.08.2017Examination requested  [2018/04]
02.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2018Fee for grant paid
04.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
[2019/49]
Former [2019/48]DK23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/46]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL23.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2009245184  (TORRES ESTEBAN RAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,10,19,23,32,41 * figures 1,4A,4B * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0089] * [I] 2-9,11-18,20-22,24-31,33-40,42-44;
 [XI]US2012317261  (AHMAVAARA KALLE ILMARI [US]) [X] 1,10,19,23,32,41 * figure 9 * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] * [I] 2-9,11-18,20-22,24-31,33-40,42-44