Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3285731 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3285731



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 179
14.11.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.10.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
17.07.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
05.07.2018 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
05.06.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
07.02.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.02.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.11.2017 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
28.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.11.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.11.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 11
04.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.10.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.09.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
15.11.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 66
27.10.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
27.10.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 63
04.10.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.10.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.10.2016 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 7