Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3285731


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.11.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
16.07.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
06.07.2018 Change - representative
29.06.2018 Change: Validation states published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
29.06.2018 Change - extension states published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
06.06.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
26.01.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
26.01.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
26.01.2018 Request for examination filed published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
03.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
10.11.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
18.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
04.10.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
04.10.2017 Change - representative
28.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
13.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication