Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3285731

EP3285731 - HAIR CARE REGIMEN USING A MECHANICAL FOAM CONCENTRATED CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2018/09]
Inventor(s)01 / TORRES RIVERA, Jazmin, Veronica
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
02 / KAUFMAN, Kathleen, Mary
5188 Castlebrook Court
Cincinnati, OH 45247 / US
03 / GLENN, Robert, Wayne, Jr.
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
 [2018/09]
Representative(s)Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/09]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date16720292.822.04.2016
[2018/09]
WO2016US28855
Priority number, dateUS201562151666P23.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562151666 P
[2018/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016172489
Date:27.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3285731
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/34, A61K8/41, A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61Q5/02, A61K8/60, A61Q5/12, A61K8/898, A61K8/04
[2018/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/09]
TitleGerman:HAARPFLEGESCHEMA MIT EINER MECHANISCHEN SCHAUMKONZENTRIERTEN HAARSPÜLUNG[2018/09]
English:HAIR CARE REGIMEN USING A MECHANICAL FOAM CONCENTRATED CONDITIONER[2018/09]
French:RÉGIME DE SOINS CAPILLAIRES À L'AIDE D'UN APRÈS-SHAMPOING CONCENTRÉ À MOUSSE MÉCANIQUE[2018/09]
Entry into regional phase04.10.2017National basic fee paid 
04.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/09]
04.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
17.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2018/49]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2004108099  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]; ASARI SATOMI [JP]; GUSKEY SUSAN MARIE [JP]; KHA) [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 4 * * page 10 - page 12 * * page 16 * * claim - *;
 [I]WO2004108101  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]; KHAN GOLAM FARUQUE [JP]; GUSKEY SUSAN MARIE [JP) [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 11 - page 12 * * page 15 * * claim - *;
 [I]WO2007002564  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]; UEHARA NOBUAKI [JP]; WELLS ROBERT LEE [US]; HAT) [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 4 * * page 22 - page 23 * * claim - * * page 15, lines 12, 27 * * examples 8, 10 *;
 [I]WO2007002566  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]; GUSKEY SUSAN MARIE [US]; SAITO KOICHI [JP]; RIE) [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 28, line 14 * * example - * * claim - * * page 18, line 22 *;
 [I]EP0455185  (CURTIS HELENE IND INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 23, line 48 - page 24, line 3 * * page 14, line 28 - line 35 * * page 3, line 9 - line 16 * * claim - * * examples 3, 5 * * page 2, line 18 - line 22 *;
 [A]WO2005063175  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]; UNILEVER NV [NL]; LEVER HINDUSTAN LTD [IN]; NEKLUDO) [A] 1-15 * page 20, line 4 - line 7; example -; claim -; table I *;
 [A]US2002031478  (KELLER WALTER [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO2004078901  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]; CULERON GUY HUBERT STEPHANE SY [BE]; HUTTON HOW) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2015195512  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [XP] 1-15 * example -; claim - *;
 [IP]WO2015195542  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [IP] 1-15 * example -; claim - *;
 [IP]WO2015195543  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [IP] 1-15 * example -; claim - *;
 [IP]WO2015195544  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [IP] 1-15 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO2010141683  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]; HUTTON HOWARD DAVID III [US]; OKADA TOSHIYUKI [) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MINTEL, "Procter & Gamble: Reinforcing conditioner", GNPD, MINTEL, (201405), Database accession no. 2419965, XP002762075 [A] 1-15
 [A]  - MINTEL, "Procter & Gamble: Clarifying shampoo", GNPD, MINTEL, (201406), Database accession no. 2503021, XP002762074 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2486921
 US2486922
 US2396278
 US5104646
 US5106609
 US3929678
 US2658072
 US2438091
 US2528378
 US4185087
 EP0530974
 WO0210257
 US2009220443
 WO2012006324
 WO2012009525
 US3480616
 US4565647
 WO2013148778
 EP0283165
 WO2004078903
 WO2004078901
 WO2005078063
    - SOLAREK, D. B., Cationic Starches in Modified Starches: Properties and Uses, CRC PRESS, INC., (1986), pages 113 - 125
    - QIN-JI PENG; ARTHUR S. PERLIN, "Observation on NMR Spectra of Starches in Dimethyl Sulfoxide, Iodine-Complexing, and Solvating in Water-Dimethyl Sulfoxide", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 160, pages 57 - 72
    - J. HOWARD BRADBURY; J. GRANT COLLINS, "An Approach to the Structural Analysis of Oligosaccharides by NMR Spectroscopy", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1979), vol. 71, pages 15 - 25
    - "HSPIP - Hansen Solubility Parameters in Practice", STEVEN ABBOTT; HIROSHI YAMAMOTO'S, program