Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3289568

EP3289568 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SYNTHESISING A TERRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.11.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Cape Town
Lovers Walk
Rondebosch
7700 Cape Town / ZA
[2018/10]
Inventor(s)01 / GAIN, James Edward
61 Lower Wrensch Road
Observatory
7925 Cape Town / ZA
02 / MERRY, Bruce Charles
12B Dreyersdal Farm Road
Bergvliet
7945 Cape Town / ZA
03 / MARAIS, Patrick Craig
8 Golden Sands
63 Athens Road
Table View
7441 Cape Town / ZA
 [2018/10]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/10]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16721498.029.04.2016
[2018/10]
WO2016IB52442
Priority number, dateGB2015000747130.04.2015         Original published format: GB 201507471
[2018/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016174627
Date:03.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3289568
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016
[2018/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/20, G06T17/00, H04N19/597, H04N19/88
[2019/45]
Former International [2018/10]G06T17/05, G06T19/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/10]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE EINES GELÄNDES[2018/10]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SYNTHESISING A TERRAIN[2018/10]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SYNTHÈSE D'UN TERRAIN[2018/10]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2017National basic fee paid 
28.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/10]
28.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010066866  (LIM CHOONG GYOO [KR]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] *;
 [A]  - Justin Crause, Andrew Flower and Patrick Marais, "A system for real-time deformable terrain", SAICSIT '11 Proceedings of the South African Institute of Computer Scientists and Information Technologists Conference on Knowledge, Innovation and Leadership in a Diverse, Multidisciplinary Environment, ISBN 978-1-4503-0878-6, (20111003), pages 77 - 86, URL: http://dl.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=2072231, (20160711), XP002759756 [A] 1-30 * abstract *
 [A]  - Flora Ponjou Tasse, "Distributed texture-based terrain synthesis (Thesis)", University of Cape Town, South Africa, (201106), pages FP - vi, 1-112, URL: https://www.cl.cam.ac.uk/~fp289/pdfs/MScThesis_lowres.pdf, (20160711), XP002759757 [A] 1-30 * Sections 3.3, 3.4 *