Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3294728

EP3294728 - SUBSTITUTED QUINOXALINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SELVITA S.A.
ul. Bobrzynskiego 14
30 348 Krakow / PL
[2018/12]
Inventor(s)01 / FABRITIUS, Charles-Henry Robert Yves
ul. Szwai 7/16
30-383 Krakow / PL
02 / NOWAK, Mateusz Oktawian
sl. Harasymowicza 9/3
30-376 Krakow / PL
03 / WIKLIK, Katarzyna Anna
Os. Bohaterów Wrzesnia 60/21
31-621 Krakow / PL
04 / SABINIARZ, Aleksandra Barbara
ul. Szwai 7/49
30-383 Krakow / PL
05 / BIEN, Marcin Dominik
Wielmoza 264
32-045 Suloszowa / PL
06 / BUDA, Anna Malgorzata
ul. Szuwarowa 4/63A
30- 384 Krakow / PL
07 / GUZIK, Pawel Szczepan
ul. Ugorek 1/132
31- 450 Krakow / PL
08 / BIALAS, Arkadiusz Kacper
ul. Graniczna 12
98-300 Wielun / PL
09 / PAWLIK, Henryk Edward
os. Dywizjonu 303 42/35
31-875 Krakow / PL
10 / BOUTARD, Nicolas Felix Pierre
ul. T. Szafrana 5C/6
30-363 Krakow / PL
 [2018/12]
Representative(s)Ledl, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/12]Ledl, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date16723018.412.05.2016
[2018/12]
WO2016EP00784
Priority number, dateEP2015000144413.05.2015         Original published format: EP 15001444
EP2015046001613.05.2015         Original published format: EP 15460016
[2018/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016180537
Date:17.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3294728
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016
[2018/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/14, C07D403/04, C07D407/14, C07D417/14, C07D419/14, C07D471/04, A61K31/498, A61P35/00
[2018/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/12]
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE CHINOXALINDERIVATE[2018/12]
English:SUBSTITUTED QUINOXALINE DERIVATIVES[2018/12]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE QUINOXALINE SUBSTITUÉS[2018/12]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2017National basic fee paid 
12.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/12]
12.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US2014128392  (MCCALL JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *;
 [A]US2012302631  (LEE YONG-HWAN [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2011161201  (KANCERA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2011103557  (ADVANCED CANCER THERAPEUTICS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2008156783  (UNIV LOUISVILLE RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2012177749  (TAPOLSKY GILLES [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO03097615  (SCIOS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * claim 1 *
 [AD]  - BROOKE DARBY G ET AL, "Targeting the Warburg Effect in cancer; relationships for 2-arylpyridazinones as inhibitors of the key glycolytic enzyme 6-phosphofructo-2-kinase/2,6-bisphosphatase 3 (PFKFB3)", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, (20131230), vol. 22, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2013.12.041, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 1029 - 1039, XP028818296 [AD] 1-19 * abstract * * page 1030; figure 1 * * page 1030 - page 1031; tables 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2013.12.041