Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3298192

EP3298192 - TREATMENT OF FABRICS AND TEXTILES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nikwax Limited
Unit F Durgates Industrial Estate
Wadhurst, East Sussex TN5 6DF / GB
[2018/13]
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, Nicholas
Warwick House
Church Street
Ticehurst East Sussex TN5 7AA / GB
02 / ELLIS, David John
27 Orchard Road
Burgess Hill West Sussex RH15 9PG / GB
 [2018/13]
Representative(s)Hodge, Emma Jane
Brookes IP
Windsor House
6-10 Mount Ephraim Road
Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB
[2018/13]
Application number, filing date16724452.417.05.2016
[2018/13]
WO2016GB51413
Priority number, dateGB2015000852718.05.2015         Original published format: GB 201508527
GB2016000717825.04.2016         Original published format: GB 201607178
[2018/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016185195
Date:24.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3298192
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016
[2018/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:D06M13/188, D06M15/03
[2018/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/13]
Extension statesBA18.12.2017
ME18.12.2017
Validation statesMA18.12.2017
MD18.12.2017
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON GEWEBEN UND TEXTILIEN[2018/13]
English:TREATMENT OF FABRICS AND TEXTILES[2018/13]
French:TRAITEMENT D'ÉTOFFES ET TEXTILES[2018/13]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2017National basic fee paid 
18.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/13]
18.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XAI]EP2267216  (COGNIS IP MAN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] * * example 1 * * claim 1 * [A] 10 [I] 5,12;
 [IP]WO2016058781  (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]) [IP] 1,3-9 * page 1, lines 16-18 * * page 3, lines 19-20 and 22-23 * * page 8, lines 25-27 * * page 10, line 5 and 16 * * examples 1-7 *;
 [A]WO9810134  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004121680  (YAHIAOUI ALI [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *