Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3289499

EP3289499 - DETECTION OF MALFUNCTION OF FLOW MONITORING SYSTEM OF FLOW CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2018/10]
Inventor(s)01 / HUDSON, Joseph
948 Amethyst Ct.
O'fallon, MO 63366 / US
 [2018/10]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/10]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16724763.429.04.2016
[2018/10]
WO2016US29925
Priority number, dateUS201562154362P29.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562154362 P
[2018/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016176521
Date:03.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3289499
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016
[2018/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00, A61J15/00, A61M5/172
[2018/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/10]
TitleGerman:FESTSTELLUNG VON FEHLFUNKTIONEN EINES DURCHFLUSSÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEMS EINER FLUSSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/10]
English:DETECTION OF MALFUNCTION OF FLOW MONITORING SYSTEM OF FLOW CONTROL APPARATUS[2018/10]
French:DÉTECTION DE DYSFONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE D'ÉCOULEMENT D'UN APPAREIL DE RÉGULATION D'ÉCOULEMENT[2018/10]
Entry into regional phase26.10.2017National basic fee paid 
26.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/10]
26.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2010082011  (LEWIS THOMAS G [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP2241344  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025] * * claim - *;
 [A]EP0416911  (PACESETTER INFUSION LTD [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 3, line 34 - column 7, line 15 *;
 [A]US7684938  (FELLER MURRAY F [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2014358081  (DUMAS III JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *