Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3082653

EP3082653 - INTERVERTEBRAL SPACER THAT DYNAMICALLY PROMOTES BONE GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIMPLIFY MEDICAL Pty LIMITED
201 San Antonio Circle
Suite 115
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
[2019/39]
Former [2016/43]For all designated states
SIMPLIFY MEDICAL Pty LIMITED
201 San Antonio Circle
Suite 115
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARRAMON, Yves
1063 Morse Avenue Apt. 17-303
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
02 / HOVDA, David
1900 Miramonte Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
 [2016/44]
Former [2016/43]01 / ARRAMON, Yves
1063 Morse Avenue, Apt. 17-303
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
02 / HOVDA, David
1900 Miramonte Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/39]
Former [2016/43]V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
Carnegieplein 5
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date16724840.010.03.2016
[2016/43]
WO2016US21747
Priority number, dateUS201562131154P10.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562131154 P
US20161506577409.03.2016         Original published format: US201615065774
[2016/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016145180
Date:15.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3082653
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2016
[2016/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3082653
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.09.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/00, A61F2/44, A61F2/46
[2016/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZWISCHENWIRBELDISTANZSTÜCK MIT DYNAMISCHER FÖRDERUNG DES KNOCHENWACHSTUMS[2016/43]
English:INTERVERTEBRAL SPACER THAT DYNAMICALLY PROMOTES BONE GROWTH[2016/43]
French:ÉCARTEUR INTERVERTÉBRAL FAVORISANT UNE CROISSANCE OSSEUSE DYNAMIQUE[2016/43]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2016National basic fee paid 
03.06.2016Search fee paid 
03.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
08.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2019Fee for grant paid
14.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US2009192617  (ARRAMON YVES [US], et al) [X] 1, 5, 6, 10-17 * entire document *;
 [A]US2014052258  (BALL HIEU T [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *;
 [A]US2013253650  (ASHLEY JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *;
 [A]US2010312346  (KUEENZI THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *;
 [A]US2013345814  (WALKENHORST JARED [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *