Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465255

EP3465255 - RADAR PROBING EMPLOYING PILOT SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Mobile Communications Inc.
4-12-3 Higashi-Shinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / YING, Zhinong
Fanans Gränd 10
226 48 Lund / SE
02 / BOLIN, Thomas
Drätselgränden 7
226 47 Lund / SE
03 / KARLSSON, Peter, C.
Blåbärsstigen 7
227 38 Lund / SE
04 / BENGTSSON, Erik
Anders Sassers v. 17
241 35 Eslöv / SE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Neusser, Sebastian
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16726114.801.06.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016EP62338
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207041
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465255
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/02, G01S7/00, G01S13/86
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:RADARSONDIERUNG MIT ANWENDUNG VON PILOTSIGNALEN[2019/15]
English:RADAR PROBING EMPLOYING PILOT SIGNALS[2019/15]
French:SONDAGE RADAR UTILISANT DES SIGNAUX PILOTES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2007096885  (CHENG YONG-HUA [TW], et al) [X] 1,8,9,12-15,17,20 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0037] * [I] 5,6,10,11;
 [XI]WO2014125447  (UNIV CAPE TOWN [ZA]) [X] 1-4,8,9,12-15,17-20 * figures 1-3 * * page 10, line 24 - page 13, line 5 * * page 14 - page 16, line 2 * [I] 5,6,10,11,16;
 [XI]GB2428921  (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [X] 1-4,7-9,12-15,17,19,20 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 10 - page 5, line 5 * [I] 5,6,10,11,16;
 [A]WO2012037680  (ECOLE POLYTECH [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-5 * * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 3 * * page 14, line 3 - page 17, line 19 *