Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3317950

EP3317950 - CONNECTIONSYSTEM FOR PLUG POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/19]CONNECTING SYSTEM FOR PLUG POSITIONING
[2019/43]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019Change - classificationpublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - classificationpublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - English titlepublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - French titlepublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBM-Papst Mulfingen GmbH&CO. KG
Bachmühle 2
74673 Mulfingen / DE
[2018/19]
Inventor(s)01 / BERBERICH, Joachim
Am Lausenberg 15
74722 Buchen / DE
02 / HOLDERBACH, Christoph
Alter Sportplatz 13
74722 Buchen / DE
03 / WOLFARTH, Stefanie
Pfitzingen 78
97996 Niederstetten / DE
04 / LUST, Alexander
Bodelschwinghstraße 8
74182 Obersulm / DE
05 / EHMANN, Tobias
Söllbachweg 6
74632 Neuenstein / DE
06 / KALLER, Andreas
Kirchstrasse 23
74613 Öhringen / DE
 [2018/19]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/19]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date16726883.803.06.2016
[2018/19]
WO2016EP62677
Priority number, dateDE20151011419226.08.2015         Original published format: DE102015114192
[2018/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017032471
Date:02.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3317950
Date:09.05.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017
[2018/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02K5/22, H02K5/10, H01R13/74
[2019/43]
Former International [2018/19]H02K5/10, H01R13/52, H02K5/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/19]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM ZUR STECKERPOSITIONIERUNG[2018/19]
English:CONNECTIONSYSTEM FOR PLUG POSITIONING[2019/43]
French:SYSTÈME POUR POSITIONNEMENT DE PRISE[2019/43]
Former [2018/19]CONNECTING SYSTEM FOR PLUG POSITIONING
Former [2018/19]SYSTÈME DE CONNEXION POUR LE POSITIONNEMENT DE CONNECTEUR
Entry into regional phase05.02.2018National basic fee paid 
05.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/19]
05.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]DE102005053535  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,11-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]WO2014104121  (MITSUBA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-14 * abstract * * claims 3,4 * * figures 1-16 *;
 [X]EP1367695  (MINEBEA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-10,12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]DE19707850  (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [X] 1-6,11-14 * abstract * * claims 2-8 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]EP2216552  (ASKOLL HOLDING SRL [IT]) [X] 1-6,11,12,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]DE102011089081  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * claim 10 * * figures 1-10 *