Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469737

EP3469737 - INTERFERENCE-RESILIENT FLEXIBLE TECHNIQUES FOR PAYLOAD RESOURCE ALLOCATION IN BROADBAND SATELLITES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
28.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
European Space Agency
8-10 rue Mario Nikis
75738 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / GINESI, Alberto
Johannes Verhulstraat 173-2
1075 GX Amsterdam / NL
02 / ARAPOGLOU, Pantelis-Daniel
c/o European Space Agency
8-10 rue Mario Nikis
75738 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
03 / RE, Emiliano
c/o European Space Agency
8-10 rue Mario Nikis
75738 Paris Cedex 15 / FR
 [2019/19]
Former [2019/16]01 / GINESI, Alberto
Johannes Verhulstraat 173-2
1075 GX Amsterdam / NL
02 / RE, Emiliano / EP
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16728321.710.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016EP63358
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017211430
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469737
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/204, H04B7/185
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:INTERFERENZBESTÄNDIGE FLEXIBLE TECHNIKEN ZUR NUTZLASTRESSOURCENZUWEISUNG IN BREITBANDSATELLITEN[2019/16]
English:INTERFERENCE-RESILIENT FLEXIBLE TECHNIQUES FOR PAYLOAD RESOURCE ALLOCATION IN BROADBAND SATELLITES[2019/16]
French:TECHNIQUES FLEXIBLES INSENSIBLES AU BROUILLAGE POUR L'ATTRIBUTION DE RESSOURCES DE CHARGE UTILE DANS DES SATELLITES À HAUT DÉBIT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2018National basic fee paid 
16.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
16.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201904   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[Y]US6055431  (DYBDAL ROBERT B [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 20 - line 35 * * column 1, line 40 - line 51 * * column 1, line 65 - line 67 * * column 2, line 1 - line 27 * * column 2, line 30 - line 44 * * column 3, line 66 - line 67 * * column 4, line 1 - line 19 * * column 4, line 40 - line 67 * * column 5, line 1 - line 10 * * column 7, line 53 - line 67 * * column 8, line 1 - line 27 * * column 8, line 59 - paragraph 67 * * column 9, line 1 - line 27 * * column 9, line 55 - line 67 * * column 10, line 34 - line 39 * * column 12, line 24 - line 31 * * column 12, line 52 - line 62 * * column 13, line 3 - line 8 *
 [YD]EP2958249  (EUROP AGENCE SPATIALE [FR]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] *
 [A]EP1973240  (COM DEV INT LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] * * figures 6, 8C, 8D *
 [A]US2011044237  (OH DAE SUB [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figures 4, 5, 6A-6C, 7 * * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] *
 [A]EP0944183  (ICO SERVICES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0057] *
 EP2958249  [ ]
 [A]  - MUKHERJEE SANDEEP ET AL, "Multidimensional resource management algorithm for a multibeam EHF satellite system", 2014 IEEE AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, IEEE, (20140301), doi:10.1109/AERO.2014.6836388, pages 1 - 8, XP032607230 [A] 1-15 * Introduction * * Sections 2 and 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AERO.2014.6836388