Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3310628

EP3310628 - BRAKE ASSIST SYSTEM FOR A CYCLIST ON A BICYCLE BY A HAPTIC FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.09.2019 [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Blubrake S.r.l.
Via San Martino 12/A
20122 Milan / IT
[2018/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CORNO, Matteo
Via Conte Rosso 23
20134 Milan / IT
02 / PANZANI, Giulio
Via Marsala 21
20900 Monza (MB) / IT
03 / SAVARESI, Sergio Matteo
Largo Paolo Sarpi 8
26100 Cremona / IT
04 / TODESCHINI, Fabio
Via Montessori 64
23900 Lecco / IT
 [2018/17]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[2019/36]
Former [2018/17]Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date16728395.130.05.2016
[2018/17]
WO2016IB53181
Priority number, dateIT2015UB0155219.06.2015         Original published format: IT UB20151552
[2018/17]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016203331
Date:22.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3310628
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016
[2018/17]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3310628
Date:04.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/17, B60T8/26, B60T8/32
[2018/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BREMSHILFESYSTEM FÜR RADFAHRER AUF EINEM FAHRRAD MIT HAPTISCHER RÜCKMELDUNG[2018/17]
English:BRAKE ASSIST SYSTEM FOR A CYCLIST ON A BICYCLE BY A HAPTIC FEEDBACK[2018/17]
French:SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE AU FREINAGE POUR UN CYCLISTE SUR UN VÉLO PAR UNE RÉTROACTION HAPTIQUE[2018/17]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2017National basic fee paid 
20.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/17]
20.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2019Fee for grant paid
25.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102005012775  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-6,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] *;
 [A]DE19753786  (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1,17 * page 1, line 33 - line 54 * * column 5, line 18 - line 26; figure 2; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE102006011573  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,16 * abstract *