Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469727

EP3469727 - FLEXIBLE RECONFIGURATION OF AN ANTENNA ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ATHLEY, Fredrik
Banvallen 65A
S-429 30 Kullavik / SE
02 / PETERSSON, Sven
Rotevägen 1
S-433 69 Sävedalen / SE
03 / JOHANSSON, Martin
Krokslätts Parkgata 69C
S-43168 Mölndal / SE
04 / NILSSON, Andreas
Seminariegatan 16
S-41313 Göteborg / SE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16728693.913.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016EP63483
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215730
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469727
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/06, H04W16/28
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLE REKONFIGURATION EINER ANTENNENANORDNUNG[2019/16]
English:FLEXIBLE RECONFIGURATION OF AN ANTENNA ARRANGEMENT[2019/16]
French:RECONFIGURATION FLEXIBLE D'UN AGENCEMENT D'ANTENNE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
12.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2015326299  (PETERSSON SVEN [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,14-20 * paragraphs [0008] , [0036] - [0038] - [0053]; figures 1,10,11,3 * [Y] 6 [I] 3-5,7-13;
 [Y]WO2012152306  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 6 * page 24, line 20 - page 25, line 14; figure 5 *