Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467420

EP3467420 - ARC-SHAPED PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Luoyang Ruichang Environmental Engineering Co., Ltd
No. 8 Yan'guang Road, High-tech Industrial
Development Zone, Luoyang Area of China (Henan)
Pilot Free Trade Zone
Luoyang 471000 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SHAO, Song
No. 8 Yan'guang Road
Luoyang National High-tech
Industrial Development Zone
Luoyang Henan 471000 / CN
02 / LV, Feng
No. 8 Yan'guang Road
Luoyang National High-tech
Industrial Development Zone
Luoyang Henan 471000 / CN
03 / TANG, Juyuan
No. 8 Yan'guang Road
Luoyang National High-tech
Industrial Development Zone
Luoyang Henan 471000 / CN
04 / SHAO, Guohui
No. 8 Yan'guang Road
Luoyang National High-tech
Industrial Development Zone
Luoyang Henan 471000 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date16729173.127.01.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016CN72298
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016095872
Date:23.06.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467420
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN23.06.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:F28D9/00, F28F27/02
[2019/35]
Former International [2019/15]F28D9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:BOGENFÖRMIGER PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER[2019/15]
English:ARC-SHAPED PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER[2019/15]
French:ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR À PLAQUES EN FORME D'ARC[2019/15]
MiscellaneousEPB 2019/15: A request for restoration of the right of priority under Rule 49ter.2 PCT is pending before the EPO as designated Office.
Entry into regional phase05.07.2017Translation filed 
17.07.2017National basic fee paid 
17.07.2017Search fee paid 
17.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.01.2016Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority
17.07.2017Examination requested  [2019/15]
09.04.2018Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001
Request for re-establishment of rights:16.08.2017Date of receipt
30.11.2018Request rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]CN204478886U  (LUOYANG RUICHANG PETROCHEMICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN104501632  (LUOYANG RUICHANG PETROCHEMICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN204478885U  (LUOYANG RUICHANG PETROCHEMICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN104457343  (LUOYANG RUICHANG PETROCHEMICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[PX]CN104501632  (LUOYANG RUICHANG PETROCHEMICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [PX] 1-15 * , claims 1-15 *;
 [PX]CN204478886U  (LUOYANG RUICHANG PETROCHEMICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [PX] 1-15 * , claims 1-15 *;
 [PX]CN104457343  (LUOYANG RUICHANG PETROCHEMICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [PX] 1-8, 10-15 * , claims 1-10 *;
 [PX]CN204478885U  (LUOYANG RUICHANG PETROCHEMICAL EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [PX] 1-8, 10-15 * , claims 1-10 *;
 [X]US4532775  (HOFMANN RUDOLF [DE]) [X] 1-3, 5-7, 10-13 * , description, column 1, line 40 to column 2, line 40, and figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO0167018  (CENTRAX LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US4089370  (MARCHAL PHILIPPE ALBERT HIPPOL) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US4438809  (PAPIS THADDEUS [US]) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN201444007U  (SHOUGUANG YAHENG ENERGY EQUIPMENT MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN201548105U  (YUXIAN COUNTY ZHONGXIN COKING & CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *