Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3467420 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3467420



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 173
19.08.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
30.07.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.07.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 2
30.07.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
30.07.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
17.07.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.02.2019 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
17.12.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
17.12.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
30.11.2018 Decision Search / examination 4
30.11.2018 Means of redress Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
08.08.2018 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
31.07.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
25.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.07.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
25.07.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
25.07.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
25.07.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
25.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.07.2018 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
29.06.2018 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
26.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.06.2018 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
26.06.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.06.2018 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 8
22.06.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.06.2018 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
12.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.06.2018 Annex Search / examination 1
12.06.2018 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 3
12.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.06.2018 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 3
09.04.2018 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
12.02.2018 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
12.02.2018 Matter currently under investigation Search / examination 1
16.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 13
16.08.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.08.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.08.2017 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.07.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
05.07.2017 Description Search / examination 11
05.07.2017 Drawings Search / examination 8
05.07.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Notification of Decision on Request to Restore Right of Priority Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
04.07.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
04.07.2017 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
02.05.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.07.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
28.06.2016 Notification of Decision on Request to Restore Right of Priority Search / examination 1
23.06.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
23.06.2016 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 3
23.06.2016 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 18