Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3467420


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.07.2019 Supplementary search report published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019 Change - classification published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019 Change - classification published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
25.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
25.02.2019 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
25.02.2019 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
02.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.07.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
19.06.2018 Change - representative
09.02.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
15.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
01.09.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
27.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
06.07.2017 Change - representative
06.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication