Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3314700

EP3314700 - PLUG-IN CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2018/18]
Inventor(s)01 / HERRMANN, Michael
Hinter den Pinneichen 11
32756 Detmold / DE
02 / CLASSEN, Constantin
Peckenweg 7
32758 Detmold / DE
03 / STJEPANOVIC, Karlo
Libellenweg 12
33609 Bielefeld / DE
 [2018/18]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/18]
Application number, filing date16729919.717.06.2016
[2018/18]
WO2016EP64061
Priority number, dateDE201520103401U29.06.2015         Original published format: DE 202015103401 U
[2018/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017001216
Date:05.01.2017
Language:DE
[2017/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3314700
Date:02.05.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017
[2018/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/48, H01R4/24, H01R13/713, H01R13/518
[2018/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/18]
TitleGerman:STECKVERBINDER[2018/18]
English:PLUG-IN CONNECTOR[2018/18]
French:CONNECTEUR ENFICHABLE[2018/18]
Entry into regional phase24.01.2018National basic fee paid 
24.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/18]
24.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US5281163  (KNOX GEORGE JACK [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 23 - column 6, line 61 * * figures 1-4, 9, 10 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 6;
 [A]WO2015036472  (WEIDMÜLLER INTERFACE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 6 * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 19 * * figure 5a *;
 [Y]FR2757735  (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [Y] 7,8 * page 7, line 37 - page 8, line 29 * * page 11, line 27 - page 13, line 36 * * figures 1-6 *