blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3307077


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.09.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.09.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.06.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.11.2018 First examination report
17.08.2018 Change: Validation states published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
17.08.2018 Change - extension states published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
30.07.2018 Amendment by applicant
13.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.03.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
16.03.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
16.03.2018 Request for examination filed published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
21.02.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
16.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2018 Change - representative
09.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
28.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication