Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3307077
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3307077Global Dossier 18.04.2018A1
Priority number Date
SE1550780 10.06.2015
WO2016SE50551 09.06.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201802951Y 30.05.2018A
Priority number Date
SE1550780 10.06.2015
WO2016SE50551 09.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016200323Global Dossier 15.12.2016A1
Priority number Date
SE1550780 10.06.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR104943 23.08.2017A1
Priority number Date
SE1550780 10.06.2015