Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3307077

EP3307077 - HEAT STABLE CHOCOLATE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SUCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AAK AB (Publ)
Skrivaregatan 9
215 32 Malmö / SE
[2018/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSEN, Morten Daugaard
Egebæksvej 37
8270 Højbjerg / DK
 [2018/16]
Representative(s)Patentgruppen A/S
Aaboulevarden 31, 4
8000 Aarhus C / DK
[2018/16]
Application number, filing date16730041.709.06.2016
[2018/16]
WO2016SE50551
Priority number, dateSE2015005078010.06.2015         Original published format: SE 1550780
[2018/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016200323
Date:15.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3307077
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:A23G1/36, A23G1/38, A23G1/46
[2018/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/16]
TitleGerman:HITZESTABILE SCHOKOLADE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2018/16]
English:HEAT STABLE CHOCOLATE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SUCH[2018/16]
French:CHOCOLAT STABLE À LA CHALEUR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA PRODUCTION[2018/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2018National basic fee paid 
09.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/16]
09.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[IDY]JP2008206490  (FUJI OIL CO LTD) [ID] 1-35 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] * * example 1 * * claims 1-5 * [Y] 23,33,34;
 [IY]EP2868204  (NISSHIN OILLIO GROUP LTD [JP]) [I] 1-35 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0014] , [0021] - [0023] * [Y] 23,33,34;
 [IY]EP0276548  (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP], et al) [I] 1-35 * the whole document * [Y] 23,33,34;
 [Y]US2009074937  (GONUS PHILIPPE [GB], et al) [Y] 23,33,34 * the whole document *;
 [IP]WO2015098932  (NISSHIN OILLIO GROUP LTD [JP]) [IP] 1-35 * the whole document *
 [IY]  - HACHIYA I ET AL, "SEEDING EFFECTS ON SOLIDIFICATION BEHAVIOR OF COCOA BUTTER AND DARK CHOCOLATE. II. PHYSICAL PROPERTIES OF DARK CHOCOLATE", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY (JAOCS), SPRINGER, DE, (19891201), vol. 66, no. 12, doi:10.1007/BF02660744, ISSN 0003-021X, pages 1763 - 1770, XP002037818 [I] 1-35 * the whole document * [Y] 23,33,34

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02660744
by applicantJP2008206490
 EP0294974
    - SATO ET AL., JAOCS, (1989), vol. 66, no. 12