Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472946

EP3472946 - A METHOD OF ENHANCING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION COVERAGE IN A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM, AN UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / NILSSON, Andreas
Seminariegatan 16
41313 Göteborg / SE
02 / MANHOLM, Lars
Gjutaregatan 3
41757 Göteborg / SE
03 / HARRYSSON, Fredrik
Ormebäcksgatan 3A
416 78 Göteborg / SE
04 / FRIDÉN, Jonas
Högadalsgatan 2A
431 69 Mölndal / SE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16730344.515.06.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016EP63689
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215743
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472946
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/185
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSREICHWEITE IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, UNBEMANNTES LUFTFAHRZEUG, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKTE[2019/17]
English:A METHOD OF ENHANCING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION COVERAGE IN A COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM, AN UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE COUVERTURE DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, UN VÉHICULE AÉRIEN SANS PILOTE, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET PRODUITS-PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase01.11.2018National basic fee paid 
01.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
01.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
01.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]GB2532966  (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0029] - [0031] - [0061] * * figures 1,5 * [I] 2-11,13-19
 [A]WO2016061535  (UBIQOMM LLC [US]) [A] 4 * page 10, lines 3-8 * * figure 6 *
 [A]WO2015180180  (SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]) [A] 8,9 * paragraph [0010] * * figures 4,16 *