Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3289333

EP3289333 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF IDENTIFYING AND/OR TRACKING PARTICLES IN A DROPLET, WHEREIN THE PARTICLE CAN BE A CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illumina France SARL
52 Boulevard de Sébastopol
75003 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, rue Leblanc
Immeuble "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
[2018/10]
Inventor(s)01 / DELATTRE, Cyril
4538 Ariane Way
San Diego, California 92117 / US
02 / RIVAL, Arnaud
c/o Illumina France SARL
52 Boulevard de Sébastopol
75003 Paris / FR
03 / ALLIER, Cédric
c/o Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux
Énergies Alternatives
25 Rue Leblanc
Immeuble Le Ponant D
75015 Paris / FR
 [2018/10]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2018/10]
Application number, filing date16730887.326.04.2016
[2018/10]
WO2016IB00687
Priority number, dateUS201562153118P27.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562153118 P
US201562171603P05.06.2015         Original published format: US 201562171603 P
[2018/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016174523
Date:03.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3289333
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016
[2018/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01N15/14, G01N15/10
[2018/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/10]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND/ODER VERFOLGUNG VON PARTIKELN IN EINEM TROPFEN, WOBEI DAS PARTIKEL EINE ZELLE SEIN KANN[2018/10]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF IDENTIFYING AND/OR TRACKING PARTICLES IN A DROPLET, WHEREIN THE PARTICLE CAN BE A CELL[2018/10]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR IDENTIFIER ET/OU SUIVRE DES PARTICULES DANS UNE GOUTTELETTE, LA PARTICULE POUVANT ÊTRE UNE CELLULE[2018/10]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2017National basic fee paid 
27.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/10]
27.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2015031849  (ILLUMINA INC [US]; ADVANCED LIQUID LOGIC FRANCE SAS [FR]) [A] 1-28 * page 5, line 15 - page 10, line 28 * * page 57, line 28 - page 62, line 30; figures 52-54 *
 [XI]  - KUO-WEI HUANG ET AL, "Optoelectronic tweezers integrated with lensfree holographic microscopy for wide-field interactive cell and particle manipulation on a chip", LAB ON A CHIP: MINIATURISATION FOR CHEMISTRY, PHYSICS, BIOLOGY, MATERIALS SCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, GB, (20130101), vol. 13, no. 12, doi:10.1039/c3lc50168j, ISSN 1473-0197, page 2278, XP055250778 [X] 1,3-8,10-13,15-19,21-28 * chapter "Methods", section "Device and experimental setup", first, second and fourth paragraph, Figure 1; chapter "Methods", section "Detection and manipulation algorithm", second, fourth, fifth and last paragraph * [I] 2,9,14,20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3lc50168j
 [A]  - LI Z G ET AL, "Bubble-based droplet mixers microfluidic systems", IEEE 24TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS 2011), IEEE, US, (20110123), doi:10.1109/MEMSYS.2011.5734628, ISBN 978-1-4244-9632-7, pages 1127 - 1130, XP031982615 [A] 2,14,20 * chapter "RESULTS AND DISCUSSION", section "Experimental Setup", Figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMSYS.2011.5734628
by applicant   - BENTLEY ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 456, pages 53 - 59
    - DHINDSA ET AL., "Virtual Electrowetting Channels: Electronic Liquid Transport with Continuous Channel Functionality", LAB CHIP, (2010), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1039/b925278a, pages 832 - 836, XP007912321

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b925278a