Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469335

EP3469335 - VIBRATORY CAVITY DENSITY METER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micro Motion, Inc.
7070 Winchester Circle
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KRAVITZ, Andrew S.
3385 Birch Road
Frederick Colorado 80504 / US
02 / SCHLOSSER, Martin Andrew
4235 Evans Drive
Boulder Colorado 80303 / US
03 / BELL, Mark James
11787 N. Beasly Road
Longmont Colorado 80504 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Ellis, Christopher Paul
Ollila Law Limited
Warwick Innovation Centre
Warwick Technology Park
Gallows Hill
Warwick CV34 6UW / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16731755.113.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US37230
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217968
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469335
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N9/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VIBRIERENDES HOHLRAUMDENSIOMETER[2019/16]
English:VIBRATORY CAVITY DENSITY METER[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE LA MASSE VIBRATOIRE DES CAVITÉS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE102005044930  (SEPPELER STIFTUNG FUER FLUG UN [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-13,15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0021] - [0023] - [0026]; figure 1 * [I] 7,14
 [XI]US2016123861  (SCHEIBELMASSER ANTON [AT] ET AL) [X] 1-6,8-13,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0037] - [0071]; figures 3,4 * [I] 7,14
 [A]GB1095257  (BASF AG) [A] 7,14 * page 2, line 49 - line 81; figures 1,3,9 *