Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465232

EP3465232 - METER APPARATUS FOR MEASURING PARAMETERS OF ELECTRICAL QUANTITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via Gaetano Negri, 1
20123 Milano / IT
For all designated states
Alma Mater Studiorum - Università di Bologna
Via Zamboni, 33
40136 Bologna / IT
[2019/31]
Former [2019/15]For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via Gaetano Negri, 1
20123 Milano / IT
For all designated states
Universita' degli studi di Bologna
Via Zamboni, 33
40126 Bologna / IT
Inventor(s)01 / BALSAMO, Domenico
Università degli Studi di Bologna
Viale del Risorgimento 2
40136 Bologna / IT
02 / BELLA, Valter
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
10148 Torino / IT
03 / BELLIFEMINE, Fabio Luigi
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
10148 Torino / IT
04 / BENINI, Luca
Università degli Studi di Bologna
Viale del Risorgimento 2
40136 Bologna / IT
05 / BRUNELLI, Davide
Università degli Studi di Bologna
Viale del Risorgimento 2
40136 Bologna / IT
06 / VILLANI, Clemente
Università degli Studi di Bologna
Viale del Risorgimento 2
40136 Bologna / IT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Maccalli, Marco , et al
Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l.
Via Settembrini, 40
20124 Milano / IT
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16731809.631.05.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016EP62303
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207037
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465232
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01R15/16, G01R25/00, G01R21/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:MESSVORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG VON PARAMETERN ELEKTRISCHER GRÖSSE[2019/15]
English:METER APPARATUS FOR MEASURING PARAMETERS OF ELECTRICAL QUANTITY[2019/15]
French:APPAREIL DE MESURE POUR MESURER DES PARAMÈTRES DE GRANDEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2018National basic fee paid 
28.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
28.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2010318306  (TIERNEY NEIL MACLACHLAN [GB] ET AL) [Y] 1-3,10-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0007] , [0009] , [0013] - [0015] - [0033] , [0037] - [0040] - [0062] - [0083] * [A] 4-9
 [Y]US5473244  (LIBOVE JOEL M [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-3,10-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 23 *
 [A]US2010156441  (MOLITON VIVIEN [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0051] - [0056] *
 US6825649  [ ]
    [ ] - S. AHMAD, "Smart metering and home automation solutions for the next decade", PROC. OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EMERGING TRENDS IN NETWORKS AND COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, 2011(ETNCC 2011, (20110422), pages 200 - 204
    [ ] - F. CAI; E. FARANTATOS; R. HUANG; A.P. SAKIS MELIOPOULOS; J. PAPAPOLYMEROU, "Self-powered smart meter with synchronized data", PROC. OF THE IEEE RADIO AND WIRELESS SYMPOSIUM (RWS 2012, (20120115), pages 395 - 398