Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472942

EP3472942 - FLEXIBLE ANALOG ARCHITECTURE FOR SECTORIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / STJERNMAN, Anders
Björnåsvägen 3
SE-43741 Lindome / SE
02 / NILSSON, Andreas
Seminariegatan 16
SE-41313 Göteborg / SE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16732254.416.06.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016EP63912
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017215755
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472942
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/0491, H04W16/28, H01Q1/24, H01Q21/00, H04B7/10, H01Q3/30, H04W88/08, H01Q25/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLE ANALOGARCHITEKTUR ZUR SEKTORISIERUNG[2019/17]
English:FLEXIBLE ANALOG ARCHITECTURE FOR SECTORIZATION[2019/17]
French:ARCHITECTURE ANALOGIQUE FLEXIBLE POUR SECTORISATION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
12.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US2015200455  (VENKATESWARAN VIJAY [IE], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0132] * * figures 1-12, A1-A7 *;
 [A]US2012068907  (PETERSSON SVEN OSCAR [SE], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2016164172  (STJERNMAN ANDERS [SE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 1-4 *