blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3316844 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201680031427 EP16733117



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018193217Global Dossier 12.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2016EP65601 01.07.2016
EP15175238 03.07.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107666892Global Dossier 06.02.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2016EP65601 01.07.2016
EP15175238 03.07.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3316844Global Dossier 09.05.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2016EP65601 01.07.2016
EP15175238 03.07.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE16733117T 09.08.2018T1
Priority number Date
WO2016EP65601 01.07.2016
EP16733117 01.07.2016
EP15175238 03.07.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017005661Global Dossier 12.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP15175238 03.07.2015