Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3297525

EP3297525 - DIAGNOSTIC PROBE FOR MEASURING THE DEFORMATION OF AN INTERNAL CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Akse
520 Avenue Blaise Pascal Bât 7
Zone Industrielle
77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR
[2018/13]
Inventor(s)01 / BILLARD, Georges
2 Impasse du Thalassa
34470 Perols / FR
 [2018/13]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2018/13]
Application number, filing date16733145.320.05.2016
[2018/13]
WO2016FR51200
Priority number, dateFR2015000106321.05.2015         Original published format: FR 1501063
[2018/13]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016185147
Date:24.11.2016
Language:FR
[2016/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3297525
Date:28.03.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016
[2018/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61B5/20, A61B5/22, A61B5/11
[2018/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/13]
TitleGerman:DIAGNOSTISCHE SONDE ZUR MESSUNG DER DEFORMATION EINES INNEREN HOHLRAUMS[2018/13]
English:DIAGNOSTIC PROBE FOR MEASURING THE DEFORMATION OF AN INTERNAL CAVITY[2018/13]
French:SONDE DE DIAGNOSTIC POUR MESURER LA DÉFORMATION D'UNE ENDOCAVITÉ[2018/13]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2017National basic fee paid 
28.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/13]
28.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2018Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
28.08.2018Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2015112230  (IGLESIAS RAMON JOSE [US]) [X] 1,6 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0019] , [0023] - [0029] * [I] 2,5,7-10;
 [XI]WO2013116310  (URINARY BIOSOLUTIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1,6,8 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0016] , [0017] , [0022] , [0023] , [0030] - [0036] * [I] 2,5,7,9,10;
 [XI]EP1600103  (UNIV NIHON [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 1-4,11,12 * * paragraphs [0024] , [0030] , [0031] , [0051] - [0053] * [I] 2,6-10;
 [XI]US2007293792  (SLIWA JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9,10 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0017] , [0019] , [0023] , [0047] * [I] 2,7,8;
 [I]US2004030360  (EINI MEIR [IL], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2941860