Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3310503

EP3310503 - DEVICE FOR ASSISTING MANUAL MERGING OF MAIL OBJECTS WITH A PILE OF MAIL ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/17]DEVICE FOR ASSISTING WITH THE MANUAL MERGING OF POSTAL OBJECTS INTO A STACK OF MAIL ITEMS
[2019/18]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solystic
152-160 avenue Aristide Briand
92220 Bagneux / FR
[2018/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MIETTE, Emmanuel
10 avenue Catinat
95210 Saint Gratien / FR
02 / VOLTA, Bruno
38 allée de la Clairière
91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR
 [2018/17]
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2018/17]
Application number, filing date16733650.230.05.2016
[2018/17]
WO2016FR51286
Priority number, dateFR2015005553417.06.2015         Original published format: FR 1555534
[2018/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016203127
Date:22.12.2016
Language:FR
[2016/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3310503
Date:25.04.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016
[2018/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3310503
Date:28.08.2019
Language:FR
[2019/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:B07C7/00
[2018/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HILFSMITTEL ZUM MANUELLEN VEREINEN VON POSTSTÜCKEN MIT EINEM STAPEL VON POSTSTÜCKEN[2019/18]
English:DEVICE FOR ASSISTING MANUAL MERGING OF MAIL OBJECTS WITH A PILE OF MAIL ITEMS[2019/18]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AIDE A LA FUSION MANUELLE D'OBJETS POSTAUX DANS UNE PILE D'ARTICLES DE COURRIER[2018/17]
Former [2018/17]VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER MANUELLEN ZUSAMMENFÜHRUNG VON POSTSTÜCKEN ZU EINEM STAPEL AN POSTSENDUNGEN
Former [2018/17]DEVICE FOR ASSISTING WITH THE MANUAL MERGING OF POSTAL OBJECTS INTO A STACK OF MAIL ITEMS
Entry into regional phase17.01.2018National basic fee paid 
17.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/17]
30.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2019Fee for grant paid
18.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE102010043389  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2014087069  (SOLYSTIC [FR]) [A] 1-4 * figure - *
by applicantWO2014087069
 DE102010043389