Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3292073

EP3292073 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE PRESSURE IN A CONTAINER WITH THE CONTENTS THEREOF AFTER FILLING AND PLUGGING, AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jalca
12 rue des Ormeaux
76600 Le Havre / FR
[2018/11]
Inventor(s)01 / DELAGE, Jean-Guy
12 rue des Ormeaux
76600 Le Havre / FR
 [2018/11]
Representative(s)Cabinet Chaillot
16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/11]Chaillot, Geneviève
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date16734412.606.05.2016
[2018/11]
WO2016FR51072
Priority number, dateFR2015005400505.05.2015         Original published format: FR 1554005
[2018/11]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016177987
Date:10.11.2016
Language:FR
[2016/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3292073
Date:14.03.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2016
[2018/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:B67C3/22, B65B31/00
[2018/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/11]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE DES DRUCKS IN EINEM BEHÄLTER MIT INHALT DAVON NACH ABFÜLLUNG UND VERSCHLUSS SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG[2018/11]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE PRESSURE IN A CONTAINER WITH THE CONTENTS THEREOF AFTER FILLING AND PLUGGING, AND RELATED DEVICE[2018/11]
French:PROCEDE DE MAITRISE DE LA PRESSION DANS UN CONTENANT AVEC SON CONTENU APRES REMPLISSAGE ET BOUCHAGE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIE[2018/11]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2017National basic fee paid 
05.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/11]
04.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XPAYI]US2015121807  (TABER JAMES M [US], et al) [XP] 1,4-8 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 47] - [0051] - [0 53]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 9-13 [Y] 3 [I] 2;
 [YDA]DE2638289  (CARNAUD TOTAL INTERPLASTIC) [YD] 3 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 36; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,2,4-13;
 [AD]WO2009142510  (MELROSE DAVID MURRAY [NZ]) [AD] 1-13 * page 10, paragraph 7 - page 11, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraph 3 * * figures 6, 7, 20 *
by applicantFR2322062
 WO2009142510