Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3314678

EP3314678 - COVER ASSEMBLY FOR A BATTERY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2018/18]
Inventor(s)01 / RHEIN, David James
11068 Lambs Road
Memphis, Michigan 48041 / US
02 / GUANCO, Andre Esper
424 W. La Salle Avenue
Royal Oak, Michigan 48073 / US
03 / SHIELDS, Eric D.
4003 Stillbrook Lane
High Point, North Carolina 27265 / US
04 / PATTERSON, Jeremy Christin
180 Norwood Hills Drive
Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27107 / US
05 / CROSS, Scott Michael
723 Mallard Landing Boulevard
Clemmons, North Carolina 27012 / US
 [2018/18]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2018/18]
Application number, filing date16734513.115.06.2016
[2018/18]
WO2016US37537
Priority number, dateUS201562184624P25.06.2015         Original published format: US 201562184624 P
US20161516135023.05.2016         Original published format: US201615161350
[2018/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016209678
Date:29.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3314678
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016
[2018/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3314678
Date:24.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/04, H01M2/20, H01M2/10, H01M10/48
[2018/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DECKELANORDNUNG FÜR BATTERIEMODUL[2019/07]
English:COVER ASSEMBLY FOR A BATTERY MODULE[2018/18]
French:ENSEMBLE DE COUVERTURE POUR UN MODULE DE BATTERIES[2019/07]
Former [2018/18]ABDECKUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EIN BATTERIEMODUL
Former [2018/18]ENSEMBLE COUVERCLE POUR UN MODULE DE BATTERIE
Entry into regional phase18.01.2018National basic fee paid 
18.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/18]
18.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2019Fee for grant paid
04.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2546906  (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7 * paragraphs [0019] - [0045]; figures 1,2,4,11 *;
 [XY]JP2013143281  (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0005] , [0050]; figures 1-3,12 * [Y] 4;
 [Y]US2012276431  (GROSHERT JAN [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0213] - [0216] *